RI H5271 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an employee granted unpaid family or parental leave to substitute any accrued vacation, sick or other appropriate paid leave for any part of the unpaid leave.
Title
Rhode Island Parental And Family Medical Leave Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2019) |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5271.pdf |