RI H5261 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows bake sales to be held on election days at polling places.
Title
Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment, And Supplies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2015) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2015) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-04-08 | House | House read and passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/08/2015) |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2015) |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |