RI H5231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows patriotic society reps designated per federal law one day to speak not more than 15 min. to students about activities/membership upon principal's approval and use of school bldg/property after hours eff. 2019-2020 school year.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2019) |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5231.pdf |