RI H5227 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds one new income tax bracket for purposes of state income taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Income Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021)
2021-01-29HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback