RI H5224 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "Small Cell Siting Act", which specifies how local authorities may regulate the collocation of small wireless facilities and small wireless facility networks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Cell Siting Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Small cell siting act in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Small cell siting act reconsider (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Small cell siting act lc000479/3 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage as amended lc000479/3 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-27SenateSigned by Governor
2017-09-25SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19HouseSenate passed Sub B as amended in concurrence
2017-09-19HousePlaced on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-09-19SenateHouse passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment)
2017-09-15SenatePlaced on House Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-09-15SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2017-09-14SenateScheduled for consideration (09/15/2017)
2017-09-14SenateReferred to House Corporations
2017-06-30HouseSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2017-06-30HouseSenate voted to reconsider
2017-06-30SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017)
2017-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2017-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2017)
2017-06-13HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-09HouseScheduled for reconsideration (06/13/2017)
2017-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-05-19HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2017)
2017-03-21HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017)
2017-02-13HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/14/2017)
2017-02-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-01-26HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://status.rilin.state.ri.us/
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/HouseText17/H5224.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/HouseText17/H5224A.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/HouseText17/H5224Aaa.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/HouseText17/H5224B.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText17/HouseText17/H5224Baa.pdf
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=14761
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11135
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11134
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11133
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11132
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=15180
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=15179
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=11204

Bill Comments

feedback