RI H5219 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a health care entity or health plan to issue a decision regarding the credentialing of a health care provider within forty-five (45) calendar days of receiving a complete credentialing application.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2017-06-21 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2017) |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |