RI H5203 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Used Cooking Oil Recycling Act: would establish procedures and requirements for the recycling of used or waste cooking oil and would authorize the department of environmental management to promulgate regulations with respect thereto.
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Used Cooking Oil Recycling Act
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Donald Lally [D] | Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-28 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-21 | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture | |
2011-06-16 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2011-06-14 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-14 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-31 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-03 | Committee postponed at request of sponsor | |
2011-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-03 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5203.pdf |