RI H5152 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an exception to the prohibition on texting while driving for any person activating, viewing or deactivating a global positioning device or navigation application.
Title
Miscellaneous Rules
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-02-03 | House | Meeting postponed (02/07/2017) |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |