RI H5152 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Health And Safety (would Amend The Fire Safety Statutes To Establish Greater Detail And Specifications Regarding The Type, Manner, And Frequency Of Safety Drills In Educational Facilities Which Would Be Dependent Upon Certain Factors)
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Health And Safety (would Amend The Fire Safety Statutes To Establish Greater Detail And Specifications Regarding The Type, Manner, And Frequency Of Safety Drills In Educational Facilities Which Would Be Dependent Upon Certain Factors)
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/26/2013) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2013-04-24 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/24/2013) |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2013) |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |