RI H5151 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Relating To Making Appropriations In Support Of Fy 2020
Title
Relating To Making Appropriations In Support Of Fy 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - In support of fy 2020 approval of amendment (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - In support of fy 2020 approval of amendment (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 2 (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 5 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 5 (Y: 10 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 5 (Y: 18 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 5 (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 5 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 4 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 4 (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 2 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 2 (Y: 19 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 2 (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 3 (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 3 (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 3 (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 6 (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 7 (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 13 (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 12 (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 12 (Y: 22 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 12 (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 12 (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 13 (Y: 17 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 13 (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 8 (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 7 (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 9 (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 9 (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 11 (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 9 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - In support of fy 2020 approval of amendment (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 2 (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 5 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 5 (Y: 10 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 5 (Y: 18 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 5 (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 5 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 4 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 4 (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 2 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 2 (Y: 19 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 2 (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 3 (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 3 (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 3 (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 6 (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 7 (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 13 (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 12 (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 12 (Y: 22 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 12 (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended: Article 12 (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment: Article 13 (Y: 17 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage of amendment: Article 13 (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 8 (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 7 (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 9 (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 9 (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 11 (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - House - Passage: Article 9 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to Senate Finance |
2019-06-22 | Senate | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2019) |
2019-06-21 | House | House passed floor amendment only |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Meeting postponed (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |