RI H5148 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $20,000,000 To The R.i. Capital Plan Funds (ricap) (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $20,000,000 To The Rhode Island Capital Plan Funds.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $20,000,000 To The R.i. Capital Plan Funds (ricap) (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $20,000,000 To The Rhode Island Capital Plan Funds.)
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5148.pdf |