RI H5148 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Mental Health, Retardation And Hospitals -- Developmentally Disabled Adults: would offer private operators of state-owned group homes the right of first refusal should the state to decide to sell the facility.
Title
An Act Relating To Mental Health, Retardation And Hospitals -- Developmentally Disabled Adults
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Richard Morrison [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Lisa Tomasso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-08 | Committee transferred to House Finance | |
2011-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-01 | Meeting postponed | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5148.pdf |