RI H5141 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations -- Divorce And Separation (would Prevent A Perpetrator Of A Rape, Who Thereby Fathers A Child, From Custody Or Visitation With That Child)
Title
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations -- Divorce And Separation (would Prevent A Perpetrator Of A Rape, Who Thereby Fathers A Child, From Custody Or Visitation With That Child)
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2013) |
2013-02-13 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/13/2013) |
2013-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5141.pdf |