RI H5125 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables the Rhode Island public transit authority (RIPTA) to work with the Massachusetts Bay Transit Authority (MBTA) to allow commuter rail passes to be used as dual passes for both RIPTA and MBTA.
Title
Rhode Island Public Transit Authority
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023) |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee transferred to House Corporations |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5125.pdf |