RI H5119 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases amount of flame retardant chemicals contained in residential upholstered bedding/furniture manufactured/ sold in state from 100 ppm to 1,000 ppm effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Upholstered Furniture And Child Products Safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-05HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-27SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2019)
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2019-05-09HouseHouse read and passed
2019-05-03HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/09/2019)
2019-05-01HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-04-29HouseScheduled for consideration (05/01/2019)
2019-03-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019)
2019-02-08HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/13/2019)
2019-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback