RI H5104 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows state colleges to sell discarded or surplus technology to their students at discounted prices, using the monies collected to purchase updated electronic equipment or technology.
Title
State Purchases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/10/2021) |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Education |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5104.pdf |