RI H5097 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it unlawful for health care facilities or their workers to circumvent the state's COVID-19 vaccination schedule.
Title
Vaccination Jumping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2021) |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5097.pdf |