RI H5096 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratify amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the city of Central Falls which were adopted and approved by the electors of the city on November 6, 2018.
Title
Validating And Ratifying An Amendment To The Home Rule Charter Of The City Of Central Falls
Sponsors
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-05-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/22/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2019-03-05 | House | House read and passed |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/28/2019) |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2019) |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |