RI H5093 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Rhode Island Terminally Ill Patient's Right to Try Act of 2015," which establishes the conditions for the use of experimental treatments for terminally ill patients.
Title
Treatment For Patients With Terminal Illness--the Rhode Island Terminally Ill Patients' Right To Try Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Committee continued |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2015-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2015-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2015) |
2015-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2015) |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2015) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |