RI H5089 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows drivers' licenses and state-issued identification cards to contain medical information to assist medical personnel.
Title
Operators' And Chauffeurs' Licenses--medical Information Included On License
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5089.pdf |