RI H5082 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the manufacture, sale, and distribution of residential upholstered children's products that contain certain amounts of bromide or chlorine bonded to carbon that is added to a plastic, foam, or textile.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating The Health And Safety -- Child Products And Upholstered Furniture

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-03HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2017-09-25HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2017-09-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-09-19HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2017-09-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-06-30HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-06-30HouseScheduled for reconsideration (06/30/2017)
2017-06-29HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-29HouseScheduled for consideration (06/29/2017)
2017-03-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017)
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback