RI H5080 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospitals and pharmacies to provide public use containers for the collection of sharps, as such term is defined in §23-19.12-3.
Title
Generation - Transportation - Storage - Treatment - Management And Disposal Of Regulated Medical Waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2017) |
2017-02-08 | House | Meeting postponed (02/09/2017) |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5080.pdf |