RI H5073 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Food And Drugs: would allow the Rhode Island National Guard to participate in the forfeiture of money and assets seized through counterdrug operations in which members of the Guard support federal, state or municipal efforts
Title
An Act Relating To Food And Drugs
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Peter Martin [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-07-01 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-29 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Senate Finance | |
2011-06-07 | House passed Sub A | |
2011-06-01 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-01 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-03 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5073.pdf |