RI H5071 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/06/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for professional development opportunities relating to reading disabilities and would require two (2) hours of professional development instruction pertaining to reading disabilities for certain general education teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseWithdrawn at sponsor's request (02/06/2019)
2019-02-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback