RI H5039 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Empowers certain municipal housing courts to order a building into receivership pursuant to the provisions of chapter 44 of title 34, "abandoned property."
Title
Courts - District Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-09-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (09/15/2017) |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2017) |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |