RI H5017 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For Protecting And Providing Effective Care For Vulnerable Populations In State-funded Home Care Programs (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For Protecting And Providing Effective Care For Vulnerable Populations In State-funded Home Care Programs To April 20, 2017, And Expiring On May 23, 2017.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For Protecting And Providing Effective Care For Vulnerable Populations In State-funded Home Care Programs (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For Protecting And Providing Effective Care For Vulnerable Populations In State-funded Home Care Programs To April 20, 2017, And Expiring On May 23, 2017.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | House read and passed |
2017-01-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (01/31/2017) |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-01-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (01/25/2017) |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/18/2017) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |