RI H5017 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- State Police: would establish a "Blue Alert" system to assist in the apprehension of criminal suspects who are involved in the murder or serious injury of law enforcement personnel
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- State Police
Sponsors
Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Roberto DaSilva [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Peter Martin [D] |
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-07-01 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-21 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2011-06-07 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2011-05-31 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-31 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-05-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5017.pdf |