RI H5016 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the exclusive requirement that a candidate hold a master's degree in social work for the qualifications of the director of DCYF and allows for other degrees to be used to meet the qualifications.
Title
Department Of Children, Youth, And Families
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. John Desimone [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2015) |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5016.pdf |