RI H5013 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Andrew Gavin to join Alison Gavin and Joey Ho in marriage on or about May 4, 2019, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-03-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/13/2019) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | House read and passed |
2019-01-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (01/29/2019) |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2019) |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |