PA SR399 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution honoring the life and service of Carl L. Mease.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution honoring the life and service of Carl L. Mease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SR 399 PN 1898 (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2018-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-22 | House | Adopted (195-0) |
2018-06-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-06-20 | House | In the House |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Introduced and adopted |