PA SR285 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct an assessment and analysis of public and private recycling infrastructure and operations across the Commonwealth.
Title
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct an assessment and analysis of public and private recycling infrastructure and operations across the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 285 PN 1801 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04406 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04406 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Adopted (48-1) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Amended |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |