PA SR258 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Adopted (49-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to amend the Controlled Substances Act by rescheduling marijuana in order to protect the right under the Second Amendment of the Constitution of the United States of participants in a state-sanctioned medical marijuana program to legally own a firearm and further consider whether marijuana has a proven medical purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the Congress of the United States to amend the Controlled Substances Act by rescheduling marijuana in order to protect the right under the Second Amendment of the Constitution of the United States of participants in a state-sanctioned medical marijuana program to legally own a firearm and further consider whether marijuana has a proven medical purpose.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 258 PN 1684 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 258 PN 1439, A6899, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-6899 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateAdopted (49-0)
2018-04-23SenateAmended (46-0)
2018-04-16SenateRemoved from table
2018-04-16SenateLaid on the table
2018-01-29SenateReported as committed
2018-01-26SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=R&bn=258
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=R&billNbr=0258&pn=1439
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=R&billNbr=0258&pn=1684
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=01/29/2018&RollCallId=631
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=470
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=488

Bill Comments

feedback