PA SB986 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-22 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-22 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act providing for banning bonuses provided to employees of Commonwealth agencies.
Title
An Act providing for banning bonuses provided to employees of Commonwealth agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-22 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-22 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-22 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-22 | First consideration | |
2008-09-22 | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill dropped from calendar | |
2008-09-22 | Reported as committed | |
2008-09-15 | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented | |
2007-10-18 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2007-10-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-10-16 | Amended on third consideration | |
2007-10-15 | Second consideration | |
2007-10-02 | First consideration | |
2007-10-02 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-20 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=986 |