PA SB982 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Hearing: Sep 25 @ 11:00 am in Room 60 East Wing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Hearing: Sep 25 @ 11:00 am in Room 60 East Wing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in contracts, further providing for letting contracts.
Title
In contracts, further providing for letting contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] | Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Sen. Carolyn Comitta [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 982 PN 1235, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 982 PN 1235, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-03-18 | House | In the House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-12-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |