PA SB970 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1471, No.165), known as the Sexual Assault Testing and Evidence Collection Act, further providing for definitions and for sexual assault evidence collection program; and providing for noncompliance.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for sexual assault evidence collection program; and providing for noncompliance.
Sponsors
Sen. Michele Brooks [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-12-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-12-10 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |