PA SB97 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Enrolled on July 19 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 55
Status: Enrolled on July 19 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 55
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for definitions, for exclusions, for assessment and for refund; in personal income tax, further providing for operational provisions and for assessment; in corporate net income tax, further providing for assessments; in bank and trust company shares tax, further providing for ascertainment of taxable amount and exclusion of United States obligations; in realty transfer tax, further providing for assessment and notice; providing for a film production tax credit and conferring powers and duties upon the Department of Community and Economic Development and providing for a resource enhancement and protection tax credit; in neighborhood assistance tax credit, further providing for definitions, for tax credit and for grant of tax credit and providing for pass-through entities; in malt beverage tax, further providing for departmental assessment; and providing for powder metallurgy parts.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for definitions, for exclusions, for assessment and for refund; in personal income tax, further providing for operational provisions and for assessment; in corporate net income tax, further providing for assessments; in bank and trust company shares tax, further providing for ascertainment of taxable amount and exclusion of United States obligations; in realty transfer tax, further providing for assessment and notice; providing for a film production tax credit and conferring powers and duties upon the Department of Community and Economic Development and providing for a resource enhancement and protection tax credit; in neighborhood assistance tax credit, further providing for definitions, for tax credit and for grant of tax credit and providing for pass-through entities; in malt beverage tax, further providing for departmental assessment; and providing for powder metallurgy parts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-25 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-07-19 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-07-17 | Signed in House | |
2007-07-19 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-07-17 | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments | |
2007-07-17 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2007-07-16 | Referred to RULES | |
2007-07-16 | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate | |
2007-07-15 | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended | |
2007-07-10 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2007-07-10 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-07-08 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-07-07 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-07-07 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-07-04 | Removed from table | |
2007-07-03 | Laid on the table | |
2007-07-03 | First consideration | |
2007-07-03 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-28 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2007-06-27 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-26 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-06-18 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-13 | First consideration | |
2007-06-13 | Reported as amended | |
2007-02-15 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=97 |