PA SB964 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1456, No.160), known as the Social Security Number Privacy Act, further providing for the effective date of the act.
Title
Further providing for the effective date of the act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-03-17 | First consideration | |
2010-03-17 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-12 | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |