PA SB946 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of January 24, 1966 (1965 P.L.1535, No.537), known as the Pennsylvania Sewage Facilities Act, further providing for definitions, for official plans and for permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for official plans and for permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2013-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2013-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2013-06-18SenateReported as committed
2013-05-15SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback