PA SB931 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-15 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-15 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in educational tax credits, further providing for definitions.
Title
In educational tax credits, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] |
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 931 PN 1196, Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2021-12-14 | House | In the House |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (41-8) |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-11-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |