PA SB914 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Act No. 4A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Act No. 4A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of November 30, 1965 (P.L.843, No.355), entitled "An act providing for the establishment and operation of Temple University as an instrumentality of the Commonwealth to serve as a State-related university in the higher education system of the Commonwealth; providing for change of name; providing for the composition of the board of trustees; terms of trustees, and the power and duties of such trustees; providing for preference to Pennsylvania residents in tuition; providing for public support and capital improvements; authorizing appropriations in amounts to be fixed annually by the General Assembly; providing for the auditing of accounts of expenditures from said appropriations; authorizing the issuance of bonds exempt from taxation within the Commonwealth; requiring the President to make an annual report of the operations of Temple University," making an appropriation for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of such appropriation; and providing a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Title
A Supplement to the act of November 30, 1965 (P.L.843, No.355), entitled "An act providing for the establishment and operation of Temple University as an instrumentality of the Commonwealth to serve as a State-related university in the higher education system of the Commonwealth; providing for change of name; providing for the composition of the board of trustees; terms of trustees, and the power and duties of such trustees; providing for preference to Pennsylvania residents in tuition; providing for public support and capital improvements; authorizing appropriations in amounts to be fixed annually by the General Assembly; providing for the auditing of accounts of expenditures from said appropriations; authorizing the issuance of bonds exempt from taxation within the Commonwealth; requiring the President to make an annual report of the operations of Temple University," making an appropriation for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of such appropriation; and providing a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor: SB 914 PN 1417, FP (Y: 145 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - House - House Floor: SB 914 PN 1417, FP (Y: 115 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 914 PN 1417, NON-PREFERRED APPROPRIATION (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - House - House Floor: SB 914 PN 1417, FP (Y: 115 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 914 PN 1417, NON-PREFERRED APPROPRIATION (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Act No. 4A |
2016-03-29 | House | Became Law without Governor's signature |
2016-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-03-18 | House | Signed in House |
2016-03-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (145-45) |
2016-03-16 | House | Vote on third consideration and final passage reconsidered (129-60) |
2016-01-11 | House | Third consideration and defeated on final passage (115-76) |
2015-12-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-05 | House | Second consideration |
2015-12-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-12-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-11-30 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-24 | House | In the House |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-2) |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |