PA SB898 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1984 (P.L.1093, No.219), known as the Noncoal Surface Mining Conservation and Reclamation Act, further providing for temporary cessation and for local ordinances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for temporary cessation and for local ordinances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-05-03SenateFirst consideration
2011-05-03SenateReported as committed
2011-03-25SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback