PA SB846 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, providing for face covering or mask mandate opt-out.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In school health services, providing for face covering or mask mandate opt-out.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A02252 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29SenateSecond consideration
2021-09-28SenateFirst consideration
2021-09-28SenateReported as amended
2021-08-27SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback