PA SB844 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in certification of teachers, further providing for continuing professional education for school or system leaders.
Title
In certification of teachers, further providing for continuing professional education for school or system leaders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |