PA SB835 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for funding of high-speed broadband service infrastructure deployment in unserved areas of this Commonwealth and for powers and duties of the Commonwealth Financing Authority; establishing the Unserved High-speed Broadband Funding Program Account; making an appropriation; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for funding of high-speed broadband service infrastructure deployment in unserved areas of this Commonwealth and for powers and duties of the Commonwealth Financing Authority; establishing the Unserved High-speed Broadband Funding Program Account; making an appropriation; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-20 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 835 PN 2112, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: SB 835 PN 2112, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 835 PN 1800, 2019 A7732, CAUSER (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 835 PN 1800, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25SenateAct No. 132
2020-11-25SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-11-20SenateSigned in House
2020-11-20SenateSigned in Senate
2020-11-20SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
2020-11-20SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-11-18SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-11-18SenateIn the Senate
2020-11-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-11-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-21HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-21HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-10-19HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-29HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-29HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-29HouseReported as committed
2020-09-14HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
2020-09-08HouseIn the House
2020-09-08SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-09-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-22SenateReported as amended
2019-08-26SenateReferred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=835
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0835&pn=1144
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0835&pn=1800
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0835&pn=2112
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=5&theDate=06/22/2020&RollCallId=962
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=617
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/08/2020&RollCallId=1093
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=09/29/2020&RollCallId=2514
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1699
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/18/2020&RollCallId=2634
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1723
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=771
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=11/20/2020&RollCallId=1300

Bill Comments

feedback