PA SB832 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-04 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-04 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 24, 1956 (1955, P.L.1674, No.566), entitled "An act authorizing council of any incorporated town to create the office of town manager, and prescribe his powers and duties," further providing for the office of town manager and for powers and duties of a town manager.
Title
Amending the act of May 24, 1956 (1955, P.L.1674, No.566), entitled "An act authorizing council of any incorporated town to create the office of town manager, and prescribe his powers and duties," further providing for the office of town manager and for powers and duties of a town manager.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Robert Robbins [R] | Sen. John Wozniak [D] |
Sen. John Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - SB 832 PN 850, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-04 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-06-17 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-15 | House | In the House |
2011-06-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |