PA SB822 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-26 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-26 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for museum unclaimed loaned property.
Title
Providing for museum unclaimed loaned property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 822 PN 1001, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-10-25 | House | In the House |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |