PA SB814 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-18 - Act No. 95 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-18 - Act No. 95 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in obstructing governmental operations, providing for the offense of evading arrest or detention on foot and for the offense of harming a police animal while evading arrest or detention.
Title
In obstructing governmental operations, providing for the offense of evading arrest or detention on foot and for the offense of harming a police animal while evading arrest or detention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, FP (Y: 127 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5196 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5195 (Y: 83 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5214 (Y: 77 N: 123 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5197 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5191 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04792 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 814 PN 1178, Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 814 PN 993, 2021 A27660, YUDICHAK Amendment No. A-2766 (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, FP (Y: 127 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5196 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5195 (Y: 83 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5214 (Y: 77 N: 123 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5197 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: SB 814 PN 1822, 2021 A5191 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04792 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 814 PN 1178, Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 814 PN 993, 2021 A27660, YUDICHAK Amendment No. A-2766 (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-18 | Senate | Act No. 95 of 2022 |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Became Law without Governor's signature |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (35-15) |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-06-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (127-73) |
2022-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-29 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-10-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-10-26 | House | In the House |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (36-14) |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (37-13) |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |