PA SB813 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for application of part; and providing for local government unit roofing projects.
Title
Further providing for application of part; and providing for local government unit roofing projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |