PA SB812 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act No. 1A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act No. 1A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Title
Making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: SB 812 PN 1078, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 812 PN 1078, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: SB 812 PN 1078, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 812 PN 1078, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Act No. 1A |
2015-07-02 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2015-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-26 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-25 | House | In the House |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |