PA SB811 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 16, 1923 (P.L.207, No.153), referred to as the Municipal Claim and Tax Lien Law, further providing for municipal claims first lien, cities of first class, docketing, judgment and execution, for cities of the first class, recovery of judgment and sale free from claims, for redemption and for rule to show cause, decree, service and notice and providing disposition of property in cities of the second class.
Title
Further providing for municipal claims first lien, cities of first class, docketing, judgment and execution, for cities of the first class, recovery of judgment and sale free from claims, for redemption and for rule to show cause, decree, service and notice and providing disposition of property in cities of the second class.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Lindsey Williams [D] |
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 811 PN 996, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 811 PN 996, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-14 | House | First consideration |
2022-09-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-15 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2022-06-14 | House | In the House |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-03-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |